Brabyn, David George (CPSO#: 30634)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Otago, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 13 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Dec 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1993