Brac, Rose (CPSO#: 50192)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Florence, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 510
2 Jane Street
Toronto ON  M6S 4W3
Phone: (416) 766-7288
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 07 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROSE BRAC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRAC is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1991