Brace, Alec Wayne (CPSO#: 64736)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Dec 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 May 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
402 empire ave.
St Johns nl.
canada
a1b 1a6
St. Johns NL  A1B 1A6
Phone: (709) 699-9463

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 21 Jul 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEC WAYNE BRACE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRACE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 22 Jun 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 21 Jul 1993
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 22 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 21 Jul 1994
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 22 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Dec 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 1996