Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Brade, Anthony Matthew (CPSO#: 70250)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peel Regional Cancer Centre, Credit
Valley Hospital, Dept of Radiation
Oncology, 2200 Eglinton Ave West
Mississauga, ON, L5M 2N1
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: 905 813-1100 Ext. 4803
Fax: 905 813-3963
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anthony Brade Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Brade ( CPSO# 70250 )

Business Address:
Peel Regional Cancer Centre
Credit Valley Hospital
Department of Radiation Oncology
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANTHONY MATTHEW BRADE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRADE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005