Braden, Harold Phillips (CPSO#: 55649)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6090
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospita
Halton Healthcare Services
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Canada
Phone: (905)845 2571 Ext. 2971
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist
Anesthesiology Effective: 31 Dec 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HAROLD PHILLIPS BRADEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRADEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1985 to 16 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1990 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Mar 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1986