Bradford, John Gwythar (CPSO#: 19787)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 13 May 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 May 1997

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1952

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Apr 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 1966
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 13 May 1997

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 11 Aug 1995
Summary:

 In August 1995, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Bradford guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 26(31) of Ontario Regulation 577/75, as amended, and in s. 27(32) of Ontario 
 Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of 
 medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as 
 disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. 
 Bradford's licence to practice be revoked.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 12 May 1997
Hearing Date(s): Feb 20, 1995