Bradford, John Mcdonald Wilson (CPSO#: 42320)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Feb 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jan 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
100 West 5th Street Hamilton
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone: (905)5221155 Ext. 36404
Fax: (905)3815606
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Bradford Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bradford ( CPSO# 42320 )

Business Address:
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care
500 Church Street
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 1G3
Phone Number: (905) 549-3181

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan
South Africa
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Waypoint Centre for Mental Health Care Penetanguishene

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 10 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN MCDONALD WILSON BRADFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRADFORD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 1991