Bradford, Lesley Jane (CPSO#: 30181)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: Pelman, Lesley Jane (used until: 27 Sep 1999 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 21 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jan 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2001