Bradford, Paul (CPSO#: 66895)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
c/o Emergency Department
Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone: (519) 973-4401
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bradford Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 23 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Bradford ( CPSO# 66895 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Met Campus
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Emergency Department
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4401

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 08 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL BRADFORD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRADFORD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 1999 to 31 Jul 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1995