Bradley, Christine Ann (CPSO#: 58813)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, Ontario M9L 0A3 Tel: 1-800-775-0093 Fax: (647) 933-2904 Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Instructions: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical records can locate them at Records Management Ltd.
Date Received: 10 Jul 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 21 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015