Bradley, Elspeth Anne (CPSO#: 42972)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Aug 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Oct 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact Dr. Bradley at: e.bradley@utoronto.ca.
Date Received: 07 Feb 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 13 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELSPETH ANNE BRADLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRADLEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1990
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1990
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Aug 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 1995