Bradley, Jeffrey Robert (CPSO#: 53185)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Nov 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Nov 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mary Bergund
Community Health Centre Hub,
1100 Main Street, Ignace,
Ontario, P0T1T0.
Ignace ON  P0T 1T0
Phone: 1-807-934-2251
Fax: 807-934-6552
Electoral District: 09

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Atikokan General Hospital Atikokan
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Rainy River Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities Rainy River
Sioux Lookout Zone Hospital Sioux Lookout
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY ROBERT BRADLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRADLEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Oct 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Nov 1984