Bradley, Kenneth James John (CPSO#: 19174)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 01 Oct 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Oct 2001

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 17 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1964
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Nov 1995
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Nov 1995
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Oct 2001

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 10 Jun 2002
Summary:

 On June 10, 2002, the Discipline Committee, on consent of the parties, found Dr. Bradley guilty of 
 professional misconduct as he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in 
 respect to failing to adequately manage a patient(s post-operative bleeding.  

On June 1, 2002, 
 Dr. Bradley signed the following undertaking:

I, Dr. Kenneth James John Bradley, hereby 
 acknowledge that I have not renewed my certificate of registration with the College of Physicians 
 and Surgeons of Ontario.

I, Dr. Kenneth James John Bradley, hereby acknowledge and undertake to 
 the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario not to apply for reinstatement of my certificate 
 of registration to practice medicine in Ontario at any date in the future.

I, Dr. Kenneth James 
 John Bradley, hereby consent that the recorded reprimand of the Discipline Committee and this 
 undertaking be recorded on the College Register and that this information be made available to the 
 public as if it were information that fell within s.23(3)3.ii of the Health Professions Procedural 
 Code.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jun 10, 2002


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 08 Sep 1995
Summary:

 In September 1995, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Bradley guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 29(22) of Ontario Regulation 548/90, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the 
 standard of practice of the profession.  Consequently, the Committee imposed the following 
 penalty:

1.	Dr. Bradley was to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be recorded on 
 the Register.

2.	A restriction was to be placed on Dr. Bradley(s licence, such that he be 
 prohibited from independent clinical practice (by which the Committee meant that Dr. Bradley could 
 not practice or care for patients except under the direct supervision of a physician, and on 
 terms, approved by the Registrar) until such time as he successfully completed a course of 
 post-graduate study as a resident in surgery in a program that was at least 12 months in duration 
 and approved by the Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada.  At the completion of this 
 program, the program director was to certify that Dr. Bradley had remedied deficiencies in 
 clinical judgment and knowledge readily apparent to the Discipline Committee.

3.	If Dr. Bradley 
 satisfied the foregoing conditions, the Committee further ordered that he consent to an inspection 
 of his practice within 12 months of its resumption.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jul 25, 1994


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 18 Jun 1987
Summary:

 In June 1987, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Bradley guilty of professional misconduct, as 
 defined in s. 27(21) of Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed to maintain the 
 standard of practice of the profession.  Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Bradley's 
 licence to practice be suspended for a period of two years.  The Committee also ruled that this 
 suspension would itself be suspended if the Doctor consented to an investigation and inspection of 
 his practice in one year and again in two years by an appropriate inspector appointed by the 
 Registrar.  In addition, the Committee recommended that the inspector pay particular attention to 
 the nature and quality of surgical judgment displayed by Dr. Bradley as disclosed by the records 
 to be inspected, as well as to the nature of the surgical procedures carried out by the Doctor.  
 The Committee further recommended that the Doctor's name be published.

Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): 21 Apr 1987

Concerns

Source: Discipline Committee
Active Date: June 1, 2002
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Effective June 1, 2002, Dr. Kenneth J.J. Bradley undertook to the College of Physicians and
Surgeons of Ontario not to apply to this College for reinstatement of his certificate of
registration to practise medicine in Ontario at any date in the future.