Bradley, Thomas Douglas (CPSO#: 32135)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Sep 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Sep 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
9N-943
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4719
Fax: (416) 340-4197
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Respirology Effective: 19 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 25 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS DOUGLAS BRADLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRADLEY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Sep 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 1985