Bradwell, Peter John (CPSO#: 26996)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 16 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Birmingham, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter John Bradwell Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 18 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 04 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Jun 2016