Brady, Adrian Paul (CPSO#: 64463)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 14 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jul 1996