Brady, Stephen Clarke (CPSO#: 32111)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 02 Oct 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Oct 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 24 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 May 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Oct 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Oct 2010