Braga, Manoela Figueiredo Bertozzi (CPSO#: 91227)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Aug 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Universidade Federal de Minas Gerais, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Healthcare
Fontbonne Building
5th Floor
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 34209
Fax: (905) 521-6068
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Braga Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Braga ( CPSO# 91227 )
Dr. L. Braga ( CPSO# 83041 )

Business Address:
St Josephs Healthcare
Fontbonne Building
5th Floor
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
McMaster Children's Hospital
Room 4E19
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 01 Aug 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 14 Sep 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

McMaster University, 15 Sep 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
Clinical Fellow - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Manoela Figueiredo Bertozzi Braga may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division  of Endocrinology, McMaster University, in which Dr. Braga
                        holds an academic  appointment  at the rank of Associate Professor,
                        and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of her appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires  when Dr. Braga no
                  longer holds the apointment, referred to in clause 1.