Braga-Mele, Rosa Maria (CPSO#: 66657)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: Braga, Rosa Maria (used until: 19 Sep 1993 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian, Portuguese, Spanish

Education:University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
245 Danforth Avenue
Suite 200
Toronto ON  M4K 1N2
Phone: (416) 462-0393
Fax: (416) 462-3612
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: (416) 586-5151
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Kensington Eye Institute
College St
Toronto ON  M5G 2E2
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rosa Braga-Mele Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Braga-Mele ( CPSO# 66657 )

Business Address:
200 - 245 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 1N2
Phone Number: (416) 462-0393

Business Address:
600 - 340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 928-2132

Business Address:
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROSA MARIA BRAGA-MELE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRAGA-MELE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998