Brager, Rae Lianne (CPSO#: 84417)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: Koffman, Rae Lianne (used until: 03 Feb 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kindercare Pediatrics
301-491 Eglinton Ave. W.
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone: (416) 848-7665
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

586 Eglinton Ave. E.
Suite 404
Toronto ON  M4P 1P2
Canada
Phone: 4164893273
Fax: 4164891510
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main St. W.
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Canada
Phone: 905-521-2100 Ext. 73919
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Rae Brager Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Brager ( CPSO# 84417 )

Business Address:
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Hematology/Oncology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone Number: (416) 813-7500

Business Address:
301 - 491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone Number: (416) 860-6696

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Immunology/Allergy
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8P 1H1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
920 - 123 Edward Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Phone Number: (647) 352-2554

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 27 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAE LIANNE BRAGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRAGER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2013