Bragg, Paul Rupert George (CPSO#: 33839)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite B308
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4169
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Gillis & P. Bragg Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Gillis ( CPSO# 50643 )
Dr. P. Bragg ( CPSO# 33839 )

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 787-8955

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 14 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL RUPERT GEORGE BRAGG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRAGG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 31 Dec 1989
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Sep 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1986