Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Braida, Raymond Louis (CPSO#: 19632)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 1965

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jul 1965

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3 Paisley Street
Guelph ON  N1H 2N5
Phone: (519) 836-1622
Fax: (519) 836-0065
Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAYMOND LOUIS BRAIDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRAIDA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1965