Braidek, Catherine Mary (CPSO#: 61919)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Sep 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department Of Geriatric Psychiatry
Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone: (613) 722-6521 Ext. 6001
Fax: (613) 798-2999
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Braidek Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Braidek ( CPSO# 61919 )
Dr. J. Braidek ( CPSO# 100438)

Business Address:
Royal Ottawa Hospital
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone Number: (613) 722-6521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Psychiatry Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE MARY BRAIDEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRAIDEK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 1991 to 30 Sep 1992
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1991