Braidek, Jessica Lynne (CPSO#: 100438)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Psychiatry
University of Toronto
250 College Street
8th Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone: 416-979-6948
Fax: 416-979-6928
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Braidek Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Braidek ( CPSO# 100438)
Dr. C. Braidek ( CPSO# 61919 )

Business Address:
Royal Ottawa Hospital
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone Number: (613) 722-6521

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JESSICA LYNNE BRAIDEK shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. BRAIDEK is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. BRAIDEK shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BRAIDEK is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. BRAIDEK shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. BRAIDEK is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. BRAIDEK no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 06 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 07 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018