Braig, Florian Gustav Adolf (CPSO#: 50195)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Dec 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:Ludwig Maximilian University at Munich, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
274 Dundas Street East, Suite 300
Belleville ON  K8N 1E6
Phone: (613) 779-1311
Fax: (613) 779-1322
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Florian Braig and Dr. Tuyet Nguyen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 31 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Braig ( CPSO# 50195 )
Dr. T. Nguyen ( CPSO# 54300 )

Business Address:
Suite 300
470 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 1E6
Phone Number: (613) 779-1311

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 07 Sep 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FLORIAN GUSTAV ADOLF BRAIG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRAIG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2010