Braig, Rasso Friedrich (CPSO#: 58088)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 01 Nov 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ludwig Maximilian University at Munich, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 13 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 1991
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Nov 1995