Brain, Ian Richard (CPSO#: 103549)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 23 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St. Matthew's University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University Medical Centre
Division of Anatomical Pathology
Room HSC 2V17B
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76900
Electoral District: 04

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN RICHARD BRAIN shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. BRAIN is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. BRAIN shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BRAIN is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. BRAIN shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. BRAIN is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. BRAIN no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 22 Sep 2014
Assessment Verification Period - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 23 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018