Brain, Philippa Harriet (CPSO#: 59798)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 27 Oct 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 1993
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 27 Oct 1995