Brais, Maurice Paul (CPSO#: 42040)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 19 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Specified Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 Sep 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1999
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2002