Brajovic, Andrej (CPSO#: 101733)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 Jul 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bosnian, Croatian, English, Serbian

Education:University of Belgrade, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville-Trafalgar Memorial Hosp.
Department of Psychiatry
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON L6M0L8
Oakville ON  L6J 3L7
Phone: (905) 815-5118
Fax: (905) 815-5136
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brajovic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Brajovic ( CPSO# 101733)

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 815-5118

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Maine

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 15 Jul 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Psychiatry Effective: 15 Jul 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Jan 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Oct 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 14 Jan 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 16 Oct 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 16 Oct 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Andrej Brajovic may practise medicine independently in psychiatry, only.