Brake, Stephen Andrew (CPSO#: 32929)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Sep 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Aberdeen, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN ANDREW BRAKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRAKE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 1981
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2002
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 10 Jun 2004
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 10 Aug 2011
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2012

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: January 18, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)