Brakel, Gillian Mary (CPSO#: 76088)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Oct 2003

Summary

Former Name: Morgan, Gillian Mary (used until: 15 Jul 2001 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ramblewood Medical Clinic
Unit 101
14 Ramblewood Drive
Wasaga Beach ON  L9Z 0C4
Phone: (705) 429-8270
Fax: (705) 429-7611
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Brakel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Brakel ( CPSO# 76088 )

Business Address:
459 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W9
Phone Number: (705) 445-2550

Business Address:
101 - 14 Ramblewood Drive
Wasaga Beach ON  L9Z 0C4
Phone Number: (705) 429-8270

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Oct 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GILLIAN MARY BRAKEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRAKEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2003