Bramwell-Wesley, Vivien Hilary Christine (CPSO#: 53804)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: Bramwell, Vivien Hilary Christine (used until: 11 Apr 1996 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2006