Brandwein, Joseph (CPSO#: 60113)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 23 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jan 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jun 2014