Branigan, Sheena Mary (CPSO#: 59505)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Mar 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Suite 104
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H8
Phone: (705) 789-2355
Fax: (705) 789-1051
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sheena Branigan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 18 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Branigan ( CPSO# 59505 )

Business Address:
104 - 348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H8
Phone Number: (705) 789-2355

Business Address:
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville ON  P1G 1H7
Phone Number: (705) 789-2311

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHEENA MARY BRANIGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRANIGAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 1990