Brankovic, Aleksandra (CPSO#: 90484)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Apr 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Apr 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Serbian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Etobicoke Medical Centre
Family Health Team
400-85 East Mall
Etobicoke ON  M8Z5W4
Phone: (416) 621-2220
Fax: (416) 621-2203
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Mar 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEKSANDRA BRANKOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRANKOVIC is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Mar 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Mar 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2012