Brar, Balpreet Singh (CPSO#: 92605)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 212
2039 Robertson Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8R2
Phone: (613) 820-9403
Fax: (613) 820-3738
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Balpreet S. Brar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 27 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Brar ( CPSO# 92605 )

Business Address:
212 - 2039 Robertson Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8R2
Phone Number: (613) 820-9403

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BALPREET SINGH BRAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRAR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 29 Mar 2010 to 18 Apr 2010
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

McMaster University, 19 Apr 2010 to 09 May 2010
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 May 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011