Brar, Balraj Singh (CPSO#: 99661)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 24 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2013 to 03 Feb 2013
Elective Trainee - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 28 Jul 2015 to 24 Aug 2015
Elective Trainee - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Feb 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Aug 2015