Brar, Sandeep Kaur (CPSO#: 102541)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Calgary, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 790-0273
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sandeep Brar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 16 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Brar ( CPSO# 102541)

Business Address:
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANDEEP KAUR BRAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRAR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Feb 2014 to 07 Mar 2014
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 07 Apr 2014 to 27 Apr 2014
Elective Trainee - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 14 Jul 2014 to 27 Jul 2014
Elective Trainee - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Apr 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Dec 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016