Brar, Savtaj Singh (CPSO#: 84090)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Dec 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Suite 1222
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 1982
Fax: (416) 712-4747
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
General Surgical Oncology Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAVTAJ SINGH BRAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Mar 2006 to 09 Apr 2006
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 07 Apr 2008 to 04 May 2008
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Surgical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Surgical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Surgical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Apr 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 May 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2009