Brar, Shivdyal Singh (CPSO#: 63187)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Punjab University India, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996