Brar, Simuran Kaur (CPSO#: 73745)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 May 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 May 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital-UHN
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5809
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 11 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Brar ( CPSO# 73745 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital-UHN
399 Bathurst Street
9 East 467 A
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5809

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 23 Apr 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIMURAN KAUR BRAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 01 Apr 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Apr 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 May 2006