Brasher, Jane Elizabeth Mary (CPSO#: 31908)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Brasher Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 19 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 03 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 May 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013