Brass, Neil Steven (CPSO#: 58069)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Sep 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Sep 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 24 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Sep 2000