Braude, Bernard Michael (CPSO#: 56492)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jan 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital For Sick Children
Department Of Anaesthesia
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7445
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 24 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BERNARD MICHAEL BRAUDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRAUDE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 31 Dec 1988
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 1987