Brauer, Carmen Alisa (CPSO#: 72059)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 20 Aug 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Aug 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Calgary, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jan 1998 to 08 Mar 1998
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Jul 1999 to 20 Aug 1999
Elective Trainee - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Mar 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Aug 1999