Bravo Florez, Don Francisco (CPSO#: 56026)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Nov 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Nov 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian, Spanish

Education:University of Barcelona, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
604 Garden Street
Whitby ON  L1N 7B3
Phone: (905) 665-9311
Fax: (905) 665-9711
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Don Francisco Bravo Florez Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 25 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Bravo Florez ( CPSO# 56026 )

Business Address:
604 Garden Street
Whitby ON  L1N 7B3
Phone Number: (905) 665-9311

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 06 Sep 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DON FRANCISCO BRAVO FLOREZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRAVO FLOREZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 1992