Brawley, Gerald Peter (CPSO#: 17938)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 05 Sep 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1961
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 21 May 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1967
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 27 Jun 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1968
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Dec 1994
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 05 Sep 1995

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 05 Sep 1995
Summary:

 In September 1995, Dr. Brawley pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in 
 s. 26(28) of Ontario Regulation 577/75, as amended, in that he committed sexual impropriety with a 
 patient.  He also pleaded guilty to a charge of professional misconduct, as defined in Ontario 
 Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he committed sexual impropriety with a patient, contrary to 
 s. 27(29); and in that he engaged in conduct or an act relevant to the practice of medicine that, 
 having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
 dishonourable or unprofessional, contrary to s. 27(32).  The Discipline Committee accepted Dr. 
 Brawley(s plea of guilty to these charges and found him guilty of professional misconduct.  
 Consequently, the Committee ordered that Dr. Brawley be reprimanded, with the fact of the 
 reprimand to be recorded on the Register, that he be fined the sum of $5000.00, and that his 
 licence to practice medicine be revoked.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Sep 05, 1995