Bray, Peter William (CPSO#: 68018)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
2 East - Room 400
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5691
Fax: (416) 603-5297
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

13291 Yonge Street
Oak Ridges ON  L4E 4L6
Canada
Phone: (905) 773-1599
Fax: (905) 773-8244
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Suite 100
486 Advance Boulevard
Tecumseh ON  N8N 0B8
Canada
Phone: (519) 727-1010
Fax: (519) 727-0850
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Skyview Spa
372 Hollandview Trail, Ste. 200
Aurora ON  L4G 0A5
Canada
Phone: (905) 727-6127
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

66 Avenue Road
Suite 4, Lower level
Toronto ON  M5R 3N8
Canada
Phone: (416) 323-1330
Fax: (416) 323-9397
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

116 Cumberland St.
Toronto ON  M5R 3N7
Canada
Phone: 416-972-0337
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER WILLIAM BRAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRAY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001