Brazel, Sheila Marie (CPSO#: 58201)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 308
2238 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M6R 3A9
Phone: (416) 760-8777
Fax: (416) 760-0748
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sheila Brazel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 19 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Brazel ( CPSO# 58201 )

Business Address:
308 - 2238 Dundas Street West
Toronto ON  M6R 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 760-8777

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 17 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHEILA MARIE BRAZEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRAZEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 1988